NE LR411 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Summary
Urge government attorneys, private attorneys, and fire investigators to review questionable arson convictions
Title
Urge government attorneys, private attorneys, and fire investigators to review questionable arson convictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to Legislature for further consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Notice of hearing for March 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Laid over | |
2010-03-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11133 |