NE LR40CA | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 31 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Presented to Secretary of State on March 27, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 31 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Presented to Secretary of State on March 27, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to establish the right to hunt, to fish, and to harvest wildlife and that public hunting, fishing, and harvesting of wildlife is a preferred means of managing and controlling wildlife
Title
Constitutional amendment to establish the right to hunt, to fish, and to harvest wildlife and that public hunting, fishing, and harvesting of wildlife is a preferred means of managing and controlling wildlife
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Presented to Secretary of State on March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-03-27 | Passed on Final Reading for general election 41-3-5 | |
2012-03-27 | Council AM2631 withdrawn | |
2012-03-27 | Council AM2631 filed | |
2012-03-27 | Motion to return to Select File failed | |
2012-03-27 | Council FA48 withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Council FA48 filed | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Final Reading Second | |
2012-02-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment | |
2012-02-24 | Langemeier AM1871 adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Returned to Select File for specific amendment | |
2012-02-06 | Langemeier AM1871 filed | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Final Reading with ST49 | |
2012-01-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-01-31 | Pirsch AM1611 adopted | |
2012-01-31 | Pirsch AM1611 pending | |
2012-01-31 | Christensen AM1371 adopted | |
2012-01-31 | Enrollment and Review ER94 adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Pirsch AM1611 filed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover resolution | |
2011-05-03 | Christensen AM1371 filed | |
2011-04-19 | Enrollment and Review ER94 filed | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on Select File with ER94 | |
2011-04-18 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-18 | Pirsch AM886 adopted | |
2011-04-18 | Council FA18 lost | |
2011-04-18 | Council FA18 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Council AM1095 withdrawn | |
2011-04-18 | McGill AM1069 withdrawn | |
2011-04-05 | Council AM1095 filed | |
2011-04-05 | McGill AM1069 pending | |
2011-03-31 | McGill AM1069 pending | |
2011-03-31 | McGill AM1069 filed | |
2011-03-31 | Pirsch AM886 pending | |
2011-03-29 | Pirsch AM886 filed | |
2011-03-28 | Wallman name added | |
2011-03-24 | Bloomfield name added | |
2011-03-10 | Placed on General File | |
2011-03-10 | Natural Resources priority resolution | |
2011-03-08 | Fulton name added | |
2011-03-04 | Coash name added | |
2011-03-04 | Price name added | |
2011-03-04 | Krist name added | |
2011-02-22 | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2011 | |
2011-01-27 | McCoy name added | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |