NE LR3CA | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Albrecht name added
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to require verification of identity prior to voting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to require verification of identity prior to voting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2021-02-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 17, 2021
2021-02-05LegislatureClements name added
2021-01-28LegislatureLindstrom name added
2021-01-14LegislatureGroene name added
2021-01-13LegislatureMurman name added
2021-01-12LegislatureHansen, B. name added
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback