NE LR373 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Lowe name added
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Lowe name added
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to conduct a comprehensive review of statutory and regulatory policies of the State of Nebraska as they pertain to Nebraska's biofuels industry
Title
Interim study to conduct a comprehensive review of statutory and regulatory policies of the State of Nebraska as they pertain to Nebraska's biofuels industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=42860 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR373.pdf |