NE LR339 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the current statutory requirements governing the removal of roadside vegetation
Title
Interim study to examine the current statutory requirements governing the removal of roadside vegetation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015 |
2015-10-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 (cancel) |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |