NE LR3 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Task Force on the Nebraska State Flag
Title
Create the Task Force on the Nebraska State Flag
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30961 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR3.pdf |