NE LR296 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Executive Board report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Executive Board report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee known as the State-Licensed Care Facilities Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee known as the State-Licensed Care Facilities Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Executive Board report |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2179 adopted |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2179 filed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM2179 |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Laid over |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |