NE LR290 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-24 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-24 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine how public libraries are archiving newspapers
Title
Interim study to examine how public libraries are archiving newspapers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |