NE LR273 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Summary
Urge the United States in its relations with the Turkish government to encourage the Turkish government to take certain actions
Title
Urge the United States in its relations with the Turkish government to encourage the Turkish government to take certain actions
Sponsors
Sen. Gwen Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Reported to Legislature for further consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Laid over | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9857 |