NE LR22CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to change legislative term limits to three consecutive terms
Title
Constitutional amendment to change legislative term limits to three consecutive terms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO133 Recommit to Executive Board filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO131 Recommit to Executive Board filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO128 Recommit to Executive Board filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO130 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO127 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO132 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO129 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Dover priority resolution |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |