NE LR180 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the identification of at-risk and economically disadvantaged students as a qualification factor for state-funded, education-related programs
Title
Interim study to examine the identification of at-risk and economically disadvantaged students as a qualification factor for state-funded, education-related programs
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46269 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR180.pdf |