NE LR174 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-11 - Notice of hearing for December 13, 2017
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-11 - Notice of hearing for December 13, 2017
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the implementation of the 911 Service System Act
Title
Interim study to review the implementation of the 911 Service System Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 13, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33598 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR174.pdf |