NE LR166 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-09 - Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-09 - Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act
Title
Interim study to review the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021 (cancel) |
2021-08-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 11, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46426 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR166.pdf |