NE LR146 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the members of Congress to enact federal legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.
Title
Urge the members of Congress to enact federal legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024 |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |