NE LR104 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee to be known as the State-Licensed Care Facilities Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide the Executive Board appoint a special committee to be known as the State-Licensed Care Facilities Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Executive Board AM1884 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Executive Board AM1884 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Adopted |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1884 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1884 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM1884 |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Laid over |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Date of introduction |