NE LR102 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Legislature take steps to combat the climate and ecological crisis
Title
Provide the Legislature take steps to combat the climate and ecological crisis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 16, 2022 |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-04-28 | Legislature | Correction |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2021-04-22 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Speaker's Announcement |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |