NE LB998 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Notice of hearing for January 27, 2020
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 1:30 pm in Room 1525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require behavioral awareness and intervention training and points of contact, transfer funds, and change the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require behavioral awareness and intervention training and points of contact, transfer funds, and change the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 27, 2020
2020-01-15LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2020-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback