NE LB997 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Require city and county comprehensive plans to include an energy element
Title
Require city and county comprehensive plans to include an energy element
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-12 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 41-3-5 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8233 adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Enrollment and Review ER8233 filed | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on Select File with ER8233 | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-22 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-27 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9882 |