NE LB994 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB966 amended into LB994 by AM2685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB966 amended into LB994 by AM2685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Rural Broadband Task Force and exempt dark fiber from sales tax
Title
Create the Rural Broadband Task Force and exempt dark fiber from sales tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB966 amended into LB994 by AM2685 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2799 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER158 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Friesen AM2799 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER158 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER158 |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM2685 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM2387 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2358 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM2685 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Friesen AM2387 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2358 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2358 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2018-02-02 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |