NE LB990 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB990 amended into LB712 by AM2491
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB990 amended into LB712 by AM2491
Summary
Change reduction of sentence provisions for a person sentenced to a city or county jail
Title
Change reduction of sentence provisions for a person sentenced to a city or county jail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB990 amended into LB712 by AM2491 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-11 | Judiciary AM2183 filed | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on General File with AM2183 | |
2010-02-17 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2010 | |
2010-01-28 | Cornett name added | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10108 |