NE LB988 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for a medicaid rate study for assisted-living services
Title
Appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for a medicaid rate study for assisted-living services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |