NE LB985 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB985 amended into LB1150 by AM2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB985 amended into LB1150 by AM2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine base year under the ImagiNE Nebraska Act
Title
Redefine base year under the ImagiNE Nebraska Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB985 amended into LB1150 by AM2009 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |