NE LB981 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB981 amended into LB1204 by AM2640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB981 amended into LB1204 by AM2640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to the Nebraska Lottery and Raffle Act and the Nebraska Small Lottery and Raffle Act
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to the Nebraska Lottery and Raffle Act and the Nebraska Small Lottery and Raffle Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB981 amended into LB1204 by AM2640 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |