NE LB976 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to jury sequestration
Title
Change provisions relating to jury sequestration
Sponsors
Sen. Les Seiler [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2016-02-09 | Legislature | Seiler MO176 prevailed |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Seiler MO176 Withdraw bill filed |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28698 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB976.pdf |