NE LB974 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB974 amended into LB780 by AM2156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB974 amended into LB780 by AM2156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for applicability of the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act and the Employment Security Law to transit authorities
Title
Provide for applicability of the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act and the Employment Security Law to transit authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB974 amended into LB780 by AM2156 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |