NE LB974 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB974 by AM2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB974 by AM2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change state government provisions relating to special education funding, preaudits, planning duties, reporting requirements, contracts, warrants, and vehicles
Title
Change state government provisions relating to special education funding, preaudits, planning duties, reporting requirements, contracts, warrants, and vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB974 by AM2025 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB969 amended into LB974 by AM2025 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB974 by AM2025 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB745 amended into LB974 by AM2590 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST69 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Avery AM2590 adopted |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Avery AM2590 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 filed |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER166 |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2025 adopted |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2025 filed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2025 |
2014-02-12 | Legislature | Appropriations priority bill |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2014 |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |