NE LB963A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Placed on Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-03-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2020-02-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-24LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-02-24LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback