NE LB963 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to personal property exemptions in cases of forced sale on execution
Title
Change provisions relating to personal property exemptions in cases of forced sale on execution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2014 |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22122 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB963.pdf |