NE LB961 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Provide for economic development training grants and change job training grant provisions
Title
Provide for economic development training grants and change job training grant provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Council AM2311 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8213 adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Council AM2311 filed | |
2010-03-23 | Enrollment and Review ER8213 filed | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Select File with ER8213 | |
2010-03-18 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-18 | Business and Labor AM2118 adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Dubas name added | |
2010-03-17 | Business and Labor AM2118 pending | |
2010-03-10 | Business and Labor AM2118 filed | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on General File with AM2118 | |
2010-02-19 | Business and Labor priority bill | |
2010-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Conrad name added | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9980 |