NE LB960 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Transportation Innovation Act and provide transfers from the Cash Reserve Fund
Title
Adopt the Transportation Innovation Act and provide transfers from the Cash Reserve Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER193 adopted |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER193 filed |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER193 |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2418 adopted |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2418 filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2418 |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2016 |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Brasch priority bill |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |