NE LB953 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain public entities from charging a fee for adoption or purchase of a dog or cat by a veteran
Title
Prohibit certain public entities from charging a fee for adoption or purchase of a dog or cat by a veteran
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Legislature - Wishart MO123 prevailed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Wishart MO123 prevailed |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Wishart MO123 Withdraw bill filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |