NE LB949 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change provisions relating to state and local building codes
Title
Change provisions relating to state and local building codes
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-19 | Gloor priority bill | |
2010-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Howard name withdrawn | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Mello name withdrawn | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9765 |