NE LB945 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 13, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 13, 2010
Summary
Prohibit use of handheld wireless communication devices while driving
Title
Prohibit use of handheld wireless communication devices while driving
Sponsors
Sen. John Harms [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Christensen explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-08 | Passed on Final Reading 38-2-9 | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Rogert AM2367 withdrawn | |
2010-03-31 | Rogert AM2121 adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Rogert AM2367 filed | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-03-17 | Rogert AM2121 filed | |
2010-03-16 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-16 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2098 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2098 filed | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on General File with AM2098 | |
2010-02-18 | Wightman priority bill | |
2010-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9986 |