NE LB938 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Provide for an amendment to the medicaid state plan relating to reimbursement of federally qualified health centers
Title
Provide for an amendment to the medicaid state plan relating to reimbursement of federally qualified health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-22 | Council name added | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9842 |