NE LB918A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 37-1-11 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Wayne AM3237 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Wayne AM3237 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 37-1-11 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Wayne AM3237 adopted |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Wayne AM3237 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |