NE LB914 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax credit for certain long-term care insurance policy premiums
Title
Provide an income tax credit for certain long-term care insurance policy premiums
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34048 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB914.pdf |