NE LB905A | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Legislature - Riepe AM3012 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Legislature - Riepe AM3012 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Hughes explanation of vote |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Riepe AM3012 adopted |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Riepe AM3012 filed |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |