NE LB905 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB905 amended into LB817 by AM1964
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB905 amended into LB817 by AM1964
Summary
Change provisions relating to discharge of firearms
Title
Change provisions relating to discharge of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB905 amended into LB817 by AM1964 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-28 | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2010 | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9627 |