NE LB903 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB903 amended into LB944 by AM2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB903 amended into LB944 by AM2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for Down Syndrome Awareness license plates
Title
Provide for Down Syndrome Awareness license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB903 amended into LB944 by AM2612 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40656 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB903.pdf |