NE LB897 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB897 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB897 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change medical providers' duties under offense of failure to report injury or violence
Title
Change medical providers' duties under offense of failure to report injury or violence
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB897 amended into LB1132 by AM2361 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2342 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2342 |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34164 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB897.pdf |