NE LB884 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Require employers to provide employees with wage and deduction information as prescribed
Title
Require employers to provide employees with wage and deduction information as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-12 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8231 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8231 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Select File with ER8231 | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-31 | Business and Labor AM1615 adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Business and Labor AM1615 filed | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on General File with AM1615 | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9362 |