NE LB872 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to apportionment of income between states
Title
Change provisions relating to apportionment of income between states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 46-1-2 | |
2012-04-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Final Reading with ST101 | |
2012-04-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-03 | Enrollment and Review ER273 adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Enrollment and Review ER273 filed | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Select File with ER273 | |
2012-03-30 | Smith name added | |
2012-03-30 | Price name added | |
2012-03-30 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-30 | Revenue AM2317 adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Revenue AM2317 filed | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on General File with AM2317 | |
2012-02-16 | Nelson priority bill | |
2012-01-18 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-06 | Date of introduction |