NE LB866 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Wayne FA145 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Municipal Density and Missing Middle Housing Act and the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Municipal Density and Missing Middle Housing Act and the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-11 - Legislature - Wayne AM3387 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Wayne AM3356 adopted (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2913 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Legislature - Morfeld AM3172 not germane (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-13LegislatureWayne FA145 filed
2020-08-11LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST77
2020-08-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-11LegislatureWayne AM3387 adopted
2020-08-11LegislatureWayne AM3387 filed
2020-08-11LegislatureReturned to Select File for specific amendment
2020-08-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-11LegislatureWayne AM3356 adopted
2020-08-11LegislatureWayne AM3292 withdrawn
2020-08-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER237 adopted
2020-08-06LegislatureWayne AM3356 filed
2020-08-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER237 filed
2020-08-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER237
2020-08-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-08-03LegislatureUrban Affairs AM2913 adopted
2020-07-31LegislatureVargas name added
2020-07-30LegislatureWayne AM3292 filed
2020-07-29LegislatureUrban Affairs AM2913 pending
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt MO201 withdrawn
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt MO201 pending
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt MO201 Bracket until July 29, 2020 at 1:30 filed
2020-07-27LegislatureMotion to overrule the Chair failed
2020-07-27LegislatureChair ruled AM3172 not germane
2020-07-27LegislatureMorfeld AM3172 filed
2020-07-27LegislatureUrban Affairs AM2913 pending
2020-03-12LegislatureUrban Affairs AM2913 filed
2020-03-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2913
2020-02-21LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2020-02-21LegislatureUrban Affairs priority bill
2020-02-05LegislatureHunt name added
2020-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2020
2020-01-13LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2020-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback