NE LB861 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for court review of inmate restrictive housing placement as prescribed
Title
Provide for court review of inmate restrictive housing placement as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28368 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB861.pdf |