NE LB861 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140
Summary
Change provisions relating to the State Racing Commission, the Nebraska Liquor Control Act, and the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Title
Change provisions relating to the State Racing Commission, the Nebraska Liquor Control Act, and the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1000 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB906 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB883 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB870 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB869 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB786 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB262 amended into LB861 by AM2163 | |
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 40-5-4 | |
2010-04-09 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading with ST9099 | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Christensen FA73 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Christensen FA73 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Coash AM2163 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Karpisek AM2287 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8212 adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Karpisek AM2287 filed | |
2010-03-23 | Enrollment and Review ER8212 filed | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Select File with ER8212 | |
2010-03-17 | Coash AM2163 filed | |
2010-03-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-17 | General Affairs AM2140 adopted | |
2010-03-11 | General Affairs AM2140 filed | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on General File with AM2140 | |
2010-02-18 | General Affairs priority bill | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9666 |