NE LB859 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB859 amended into LB968 by AM2123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB859 amended into LB968 by AM2123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funding for renovation of Centennial Mall
Title
Provide funding for renovation of Centennial Mall
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB859 amended into LB968 by AM2123 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-12 | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15648 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB859.pdf |