NE LB852 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Provide for write-in space on official ballots for certain offices
Title
Provide for write-in space on official ballots for certain offices
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-12 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Stuthman AM2492 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Stuthman AM2492 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-04 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9933 |