NE LB851 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Taxpayer Transparency Act
Title
Change the Taxpayer Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER246 adopted |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER246 filed |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER246 |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2149 adopted |
2016-02-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2149 filed |
2016-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2149 |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 16-003 to McCollister |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2016 |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |