NE LB851 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act and the Local Civic, Cultural, and Convention Center Financing Act
Title
Change the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act and the Local Civic, Cultural, and Convention Center Financing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9607 |