NE LB839 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB839 amended into LB965 by AM2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB839 amended into LB965 by AM2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize American Sign Language and provide for the teaching of American Sign Language in schools
Title
Recognize American Sign Language and provide for the teaching of American Sign Language in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB839 amended into LB965 by AM2234 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41294 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB839.pdf |